THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 12:45:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 379 Church St. Unit 112A
Markham Ontario L6B0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)5540383
Fax: (905)5540386

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: To access your medical records please contact:

379 Church St. Unit 112A; Markham ON L6B 0T1

Please contact Dr Matthew Cohen

Phone: (905) 554-0383

, Fax: (905) 554-0386
Date Received: 08 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoav Brill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Brill (CPSO#: 72290 )
Business Address: 379 Church Street
Suite 112A
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 554-0383

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 379 Church St. Unit 112A
Markham Ontario L6B0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)5540383
Fax: (905)5540386

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: To access your medical records please contact:

379 Church St. Unit 112A; Markham ON L6B 0T1

Please contact Dr Matthew Cohen

Phone: (905) 554-0383

, Fax: (905) 554-0386
Date Received: 08 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoav Brill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Brill (CPSO#: 72290 )
Business Address: 379 Church Street
Suite 112A
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 554-0383

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOAV BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOAV BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998