THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:53:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Kingston Road, Suite 220
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 831-9797
Fax: (905) 839-9984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kosta Milankov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Milankov (CPSO#: 72327 )
Business Address: Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 831-9797

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Kingston Road, Suite 220
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 831-9797
Fax: (905) 839-9984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kosta Milankov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Milankov (CPSO#: 72327 )
Business Address: Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 831-9797

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOSTA MILANKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILANKOV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOSTA MILANKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILANKOV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998