THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 403
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-6522
Fax: (905) 828-6967
Address: 340-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health Diabetes Centre
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 905-883-2211
Extension: 7991
Fax: 905-883-2329

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 403
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-6522
Fax: (905) 828-6967
Address: 340-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health Diabetes Centre
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 905-883-2211
Extension: 7991
Fax: 905-883-2329

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE PIERSANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERSANTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE PIERSANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERSANTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998