THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:33:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Prospect Avenue
Box 399
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 679-5466
Fax: (705) 679-5588
Address: Temiskaming Hospital
P O Box 4040
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-8121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sears Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sears (CPSO#: 72337 )
Business Address: 27 Prospect Avenue
P O Box 399
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0
(705) 679-5466
Business Address: 24 Prospect Avenue
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Prospect Avenue
Box 399
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 679-5466
Fax: (705) 679-5588
Address: Temiskaming Hospital
P O Box 4040
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-8121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sears Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sears (CPSO#: 72337 )
Business Address: 27 Prospect Avenue
P O Box 399
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0
(705) 679-5466
Business Address: 24 Prospect Avenue
Cobalt Ontario P0J 1C0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN THOMAS SEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN THOMAS SEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998