THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph’s Health Centre
Rm 2S-236
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8363
Fax: 416-461-8466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary-Anne Aarts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph’s Health Centre
Rm 2S-236
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8363
Fax: 416-461-8466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary-Anne Aarts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY-ANNE WILHELMINA AARTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY-ANNE WILHELMINA AARTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998