THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Child, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Child, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY RALEIGH CHILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHILD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY RALEIGH CHILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHILD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998