THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998