THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
PSC Room 17-14-052
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7291
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
PSC Room 17-14-052
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7291
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LOUISE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LOUISE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998