THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998