THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 109
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-8504
Fax: (905) 294-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 109
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-8504
Fax: (905) 294-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998