THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:51:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Gale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Gale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Dec 2013
Summary of Decision:
On December 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeffrey Steven Gale committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Gale denied the allegations.

Dr. Gale is an ophthalmologist. He participated in the hiring of a young female patient, Ms X, to work as his family’s live in nanny. The medical issues for which Ms X was under the care of Dr. Gale were significant and ongoing.

After hiring Ms X, Dr. Gale developed a personal and flirtatious relationship with her which was inappropriate for him to have had with a patient. It included taking hot tubs and watching television together. He also allowed for utterances of a sexual nature with this patient and engaged in a pattern of sexualized interaction which was inappropriate.

During the doctor-patient relationship, Dr. Gale and Ms X had an intimate sexual relationship which involved oral sex and sexual intercourse.

On March 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
• the Registrar revoke Dr. Gale’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
• Dr. Gale appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
• Dr. Gale reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College within 30 days of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00.

• Dr. Gale pay costs to the College in the amount of $44,600.00 within 30 days of this
Order.

On April 4, 2014, Dr. Gale appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal.

On March 25, 2015, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Gale’s appeal.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2015-03-25
Hearing Date(s): January 28-February 1, February 4-8, 2013

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Dec 2013
Summary of Decision:
On December 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeffrey Steven Gale committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Gale denied the allegations.

Dr. Gale is an ophthalmologist. He participated in the hiring of a young female patient, Ms X, to work as his family’s live in nanny. The medical issues for which Ms X was under the care of Dr. Gale were significant and ongoing.

After hiring Ms X, Dr. Gale developed a personal and flirtatious relationship with her which was inappropriate for him to have had with a patient. It included taking hot tubs and watching television together. He also allowed for utterances of a sexual nature with this patient and engaged in a pattern of sexualized interaction which was inappropriate.

During the doctor-patient relationship, Dr. Gale and Ms X had an intimate sexual relationship which involved oral sex and sexual intercourse.

On March 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
• the Registrar revoke Dr. Gale’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
• Dr. Gale appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
• Dr. Gale reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College within 30 days of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00.

• Dr. Gale pay costs to the College in the amount of $44,600.00 within 30 days of this
Order.

On April 4, 2014, Dr. Gale appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal.

On March 25, 2015, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Gale’s appeal.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2015-03-25
Hearing Date(s): January 28-February 1, February 4-8, 2013

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 04 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998