THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:01:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shields, Lori Theresa (Used Until: 22 Oct 1998)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Branford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Branford, Ontario
N3R 1G9
Brantford Ontario L7N 3N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197515544
Fax: 5197515570
Address: 3155 Harvester Road
Suite 302
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N8
Phone: 289 217 7947
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Drs. W & L Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2019

Corporation Name: Dr. Wade Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2009

General Information

Former Name: Shields, Lori Theresa (Used Until: 22 Oct 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Branford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Branford, Ontario
N3R 1G9
Brantford Ontario L7N 3N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197515544
Fax: 5197515570
Address: 3155 Harvester Road
Suite 302
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N8
Phone: 289 217 7947
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Drs. W & L Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2019

Corporation Name: Dr. Wade Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI THERESA ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI THERESA ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998