THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Triassi, Maria (Used Until: 28 May 2006)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036
Address: Department of Clinical
Immunology and Allergy
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8627
Fax: (416) 813-8638
Address: Suite 211
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 905-553-3155
Fax: 905-553-8120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Triassi, Maria (Used Until: 28 May 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036
Address: Department of Clinical
Immunology and Allergy
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8627
Fax: (416) 813-8638
Address: Suite 211
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 905-553-3155
Fax: 905-553-8120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA ASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA ASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998