THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7A 7700 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 851-1234
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2021

Corporation Name: A.V. Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Dec 2006

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7A 7700 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 851-1234
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2021

Corporation Name: A.V. Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Dec 2006

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADVAITANAND MANOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADVAITANAND MANOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Oct 2006
Summary of Decision:
On October 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. A Vaito Manohar to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient, engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed:



1. Directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Manohar(s certificate of registration effective immediately.

2. Requires that Dr. Manohar appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Requires that Dr. Manohar reimburse the College for funding provided for the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code.

4. Requires Dr. Manohar to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Manohar may be required to reimburse the College pursuant to paragraph 3 above.

5. Requires Dr. Manohar to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 05, 2006
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 18 Jun 2014
    Decision: Application Accepted

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Oct 2006
Summary of Decision:
On October 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. A Vaito Manohar to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient, engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed:



1. Directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Manohar(s certificate of registration effective immediately.

2. Requires that Dr. Manohar appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Requires that Dr. Manohar reimburse the College for funding provided for the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code.

4. Requires Dr. Manohar to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Manohar may be required to reimburse the College pursuant to paragraph 3 above.

5. Requires Dr. Manohar to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 05, 2006
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 18 Jun 2014
    Decision: Application Accepted

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998