THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:23:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3100 35 Ave
Vernon Radiological Associates Clinic
Vernon BC V1T 2T1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3100 35 Ave
Vernon Radiological Associates Clinic
Vernon BC V1T 2T1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN FRANCIS FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN FRANCIS FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998