THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:01:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 Speers Road
Speers Medical (Locum)
Unit 7
Oakville Ontario L6K 2E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 837 1661
Fax: 905 569 6187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services (RSRS)
Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres. South. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 07 Nov 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 Speers Road
Speers Medical (Locum)
Unit 7
Oakville Ontario L6K 2E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 837 1661
Fax: 905 569 6187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services (RSRS)
Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres. South. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 07 Nov 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUANITA YIN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUANITA YIN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998