THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:36:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 530 1st Ave
Suite 9v
New York NY 10016-6497
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-212-263-3982
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Michael’s Hospital – Health Records Department
416-864-6060 ext. 2169
Fax: 416-864-5831
Monday to Friday 8 a.m. to 5 p.m.
Date Received: 25 Jul 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 530 1st Ave
Suite 9v
New York NY 10016-6497
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-212-263-3982
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Michael’s Hospital – Health Records Department
416-864-6060 ext. 2169
Fax: 416-864-5831
Monday to Friday 8 a.m. to 5 p.m.
Date Received: 25 Jul 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998