THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:16:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walid Farhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Dec 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 03 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walid Farhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Dec 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998