THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:41:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2400 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7P 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 812-2190
Fax: 8665468706
Address: 556 Bryne Dr #16
Barrie, ON
Barrie Ontario L4N 9P6
Phone: (705) 241-8745
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 29 Noxon Road
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2400 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7P 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 812-2190
Fax: 8665468706
Address: 556 Bryne Dr #16
Barrie, ON
Barrie Ontario L4N 9P6
Phone: (705) 241-8745
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 29 Noxon Road
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA-MARIE WYSYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYSYNSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA-MARIE WYSYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYSYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998