THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Medicale Grand Temblant
201 - 585 rue Labelle
Mont-Tremblant Quebec J8E 3H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 717-1551
Fax: (819) 717-1851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Medicale Grand Temblant
201 - 585 rue Labelle
Mont-Tremblant Quebec J8E 3H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 717-1551
Fax: (819) 717-1851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GROW MAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUNDERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GROW MAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1998