THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:01:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-5224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellis-De Ruiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-5224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellis-De Ruiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOOST MATTHYS DE RUITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUITER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOOST MATTHYS DE RUITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUITER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1998