THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2889
Fax: 6137384835

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lai (CPSO#: 72948 ) Dr. S. Dhanani (CPSO#: 72660 )
Business Address: CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3654

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2889
Fax: 6137384835

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lai (CPSO#: 72948 ) Dr. S. Dhanani (CPSO#: 72660 )
Business Address: CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3654

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN SUKE-WOON LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN SUKE-WOON LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1998