THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:12:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-1235 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052680188
Fax: 9052680181
Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
alliston, On.
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5142
Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Hospital
3001 hospital gate
oakville
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-1235 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052680188
Fax: 9052680181
Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
alliston, On.
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5142
Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Hospital
3001 hospital gate
oakville
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAA SELIMAN BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAA SELIMAN BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1998