THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:02:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3591 Innes Road
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-2877
Fax: (613) 249-3720

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3591 Innes Road
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-2877
Fax: (613) 249-3720

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1998