THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:10:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4564
Fax: (416) 586-3149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bogdan-Cristian Ulic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4564
Fax: (416) 586-3149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bogdan-Cristian Ulic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOGDAN-CRISTIAN I ULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOGDAN-CRISTIAN I ULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1998