THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-4761
Fax: (416) 461-5574
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6588
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-4761
Fax: (416) 461-5574
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6588
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRI LARA LUVISOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUVISOTTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRI LARA LUVISOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUVISOTTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1999