THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brookdale Clinic
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-7100
Fax: (705) 743-7104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brookdale Clinic
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-7100
Fax: (705) 743-7104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MORSE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MORSE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1999