THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:31:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kwok, Wing Goon (Used Until: 28 Jun 2000)
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can email: [email protected] or call 416-291-0051
Date Received: 11 Jan 2022

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting medical files can call 416 291 0051
or email [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Kwok, Wing Goon (Used Until: 28 Jun 2000)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can email: [email protected] or call 416-291-0051
Date Received: 11 Jan 2022

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting medical files can call 416 291 0051
or email [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999