THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:36:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
56 Prospect Drive, Newmarket, ON, L3Y 3S9
Date Received: 14 Mar 2017

Instructions/Address: Suite 318, 2250 Bovaird Drive, Brampton, ON, L6R 0W3
Date Received: 14 Mar 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Leslie Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
56 Prospect Drive, Newmarket, ON, L3Y 3S9
Date Received: 14 Mar 2017

Instructions/Address: Suite 318, 2250 Bovaird Drive, Brampton, ON, L6R 0W3
Date Received: 14 Mar 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Leslie Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999