THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:01:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289090
Extension: 46550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Canada
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6

Telephone: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5935
www,rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Causey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289090
Extension: 46550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Canada
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6

Telephone: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5935
www,rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Causey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH CAUSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH CAUSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999