THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-6200
Fax: (519) 742-9920
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiasson Sues-McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-6200
Fax: (519) 742-9920
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiasson Sues-McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY CHIASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIASSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY CHIASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIASSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999