THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:37:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request
Suite 101B
111 Waterloo Street
London ON N6B 2M4
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ketan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request
Suite 101B
111 Waterloo Street
London ON N6B 2M4
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ketan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999