THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Brock Student Health Centre
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056885550
Fax: 905-957-0957
Address: Albright Manor Nursing Home
5050 Hillside Drive
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B2
Phone: 905-563-8252
Fax: 905-563-0778
Address: St Peter's Hospital - HHS
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: 905-777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 536 Upper Paradise Road
Regina Gardens
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5E3
Phone: 9053832970
Fax: 9059570957
Address: 570 King Street
HOPE Centre - REACH Niagara Program
Attn: Dr Kimberley Bender
Welland Ontario L3B 3L2
Phone: 905-730-5647
Fax: 905-957-0957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Brock Student Health Centre
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056885550
Fax: 905-957-0957
Address: Albright Manor Nursing Home
5050 Hillside Drive
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B2
Phone: 905-563-8252
Fax: 905-563-0778
Address: St Peter's Hospital - HHS
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: 905-777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 536 Upper Paradise Road
Regina Gardens
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5E3
Phone: 9053832970
Fax: 9059570957
Address: 570 King Street
HOPE Centre - REACH Niagara Program
Attn: Dr Kimberley Bender
Welland Ontario L3B 3L2
Phone: 905-730-5647
Fax: 905-957-0957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY MICHELLE BENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY MICHELLE BENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999