THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Elgin Community Health Centre
153 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 768 1715
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Elgin Community Health Centre
153 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 768 1715
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999