THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:39:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: 613-228-2856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: 613-228-2856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIANA YUNCHI YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIANA YUNCHI YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999