THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-2060
Fax: 705-726-4826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-2060
Fax: 705-726-4826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QINGLU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QINGLU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999