THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. McArthur’s medical record requests from the North Woodlands Medical Centre can be obtained by contacting:
Waterford Family Health Centre
23 Main Street
Waterford, Ontario
N0E 1Y0
Tel: (519) 443-6694
Date Received: 25 Jul 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. McArthur’s medical record requests from the North Woodlands Medical Centre can be obtained by contacting:
Waterford Family Health Centre
23 Main Street
Waterford, Ontario
N0E 1Y0
Tel: (519) 443-6694
Date Received: 25 Jul 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sarah Louise Elizabeth McArthur committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has been found guilty of an offence relevant to her suitability to practise, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.

Dr. McArthur is a physician who is not currently practising medicine and has not practised medicine since 2010, due to ongoing substance abuse issues. She received her medical degree at McMaster University in 2001 and her certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2002. She practised as a family physician in the Brantford area for several years.

Prior History with the College

As a result of the information received from the police in 2009, pertaining to potential abuse of narcotics and opioids, the College commenced investigations, which resulted in terms, conditions and limitations being imposed on Dr. McArthur's certificate of registration as follows:

 -Dr. McArthur signed a Voluntary Resignation Form on May 3, 2010;
- Dr. McArthur signed an undertaking dated June 22, 2010, relinquishing her prescribing privileges for narcotics, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs and benzodiazepines.
- On February 14, 2011, after being referred to the College's Fitness to Practise Committee and in lieu of the Committee’s order, Dr. McArthur signed a cease to practise undertaking, which, among other things provides that Dr. McArthur may only resume practice if specified conditions are met, including notice to the College, a fitness assessment conducted by a College assessor or entering into a monitoring agreement with the Physician Health Program.

- Dr. McArthur signed a third undertaking with the College on January 20, 2012, in exchange for the withdrawal of the Notice of Hearing before the Fitness to Practice Committee, agreeing to additional conditions on her return to practice, including participating in the College's Change of Scope program. This undertaking replaced the Voluntary Resignation Form dated May 3, 2010.

All three undertakings remain in effect.

In the course of the health inquiries in 2010, the College requested and received an assessment report, dated November 7, 2010, from psychiatrist, including a psychological assessment from a psychologist, dated November 3, 2010. 6. Dr. McArthur has renewed her membership in the College on an annual basis but has not notified the College of an intended return to practice.

Professional Misconduct

On May 13, 2014, the police laid charges against Dr. McArthur. On December 10, 2014, at the criminal trial held in the Ontario Court of Justice, Dr. McArthur entered a guilty plea and was convicted of the following offences: uttering a forged document, theft, fraud, and possession of a controlled substance [hydromorphone] for the purpose of trafficking. On April 27, 2016, Dr. McArthur was sentenced to a total of two years imprisonment to be followed by three years of probation. Following her release on parole on December 21, 2016, Dr. McArthur was re- incarcerated for a parole breach in February 2017, because she used a narcotic in violation of the terms of her parole. Dr. McArthur was eventually re-released to the Recovery Centre on May 30, 2017.

Disposition

On November 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. McArthur’s certificate of registration for two years, effective immediately.
- Dr. McArthur appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. McArthur pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 by January 1, 2019.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2018

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sarah Louise Elizabeth McArthur committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has been found guilty of an offence relevant to her suitability to practise, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.

Dr. McArthur is a physician who is not currently practising medicine and has not practised medicine since 2010, due to ongoing substance abuse issues. She received her medical degree at McMaster University in 2001 and her certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2002. She practised as a family physician in the Brantford area for several years.

Prior History with the College

As a result of the information received from the police in 2009, pertaining to potential abuse of narcotics and opioids, the College commenced investigations, which resulted in terms, conditions and limitations being imposed on Dr. McArthur's certificate of registration as follows:

 -Dr. McArthur signed a Voluntary Resignation Form on May 3, 2010;
- Dr. McArthur signed an undertaking dated June 22, 2010, relinquishing her prescribing privileges for narcotics, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs and benzodiazepines.
- On February 14, 2011, after being referred to the College's Fitness to Practise Committee and in lieu of the Committee’s order, Dr. McArthur signed a cease to practise undertaking, which, among other things provides that Dr. McArthur may only resume practice if specified conditions are met, including notice to the College, a fitness assessment conducted by a College assessor or entering into a monitoring agreement with the Physician Health Program.

- Dr. McArthur signed a third undertaking with the College on January 20, 2012, in exchange for the withdrawal of the Notice of Hearing before the Fitness to Practice Committee, agreeing to additional conditions on her return to practice, including participating in the College's Change of Scope program. This undertaking replaced the Voluntary Resignation Form dated May 3, 2010.

All three undertakings remain in effect.

In the course of the health inquiries in 2010, the College requested and received an assessment report, dated November 7, 2010, from psychiatrist, including a psychological assessment from a psychologist, dated November 3, 2010. 6. Dr. McArthur has renewed her membership in the College on an annual basis but has not notified the College of an intended return to practice.

Professional Misconduct

On May 13, 2014, the police laid charges against Dr. McArthur. On December 10, 2014, at the criminal trial held in the Ontario Court of Justice, Dr. McArthur entered a guilty plea and was convicted of the following offences: uttering a forged document, theft, fraud, and possession of a controlled substance [hydromorphone] for the purpose of trafficking. On April 27, 2016, Dr. McArthur was sentenced to a total of two years imprisonment to be followed by three years of probation. Following her release on parole on December 21, 2016, Dr. McArthur was re- incarcerated for a parole breach in February 2017, because she used a narcotic in violation of the terms of her parole. Dr. McArthur was eventually re-released to the Recovery Centre on May 30, 2017.

Disposition

On November 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. McArthur’s certificate of registration for two years, effective immediately.
- Dr. McArthur appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. McArthur pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 by January 1, 2019.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2018

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 28 Sep 2021
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999