THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit B5
645 Plains Road
Burlington Ontario L7T 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-3430
Fax: (905) 681-7525
Address: 2025 Guelph Line
Unit 183
Burlington Ontario L7P 4M8
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit B5
645 Plains Road
Burlington Ontario L7T 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-3430
Fax: (905) 681-7525
Address: 2025 Guelph Line
Unit 183
Burlington Ontario L7P 4M8
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERNEST EUGENE HAJCSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJCSAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERNEST EUGENE HAJCSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJCSAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 01 May 2014
Summary of Decision:
On May 1, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ernest Eugene Hajcsar committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hajcsar admitted to the allegation.

Dr. Hajcsar practises family medicine and offers cosmetic treatments in a clinic shared with his now ex-spouse. Dr. Hajcsar saw Patient A as a patient on numerous occasions including acting as her family physician when his ex-spouse, Patient A’s primary family physician, was on maternity leave. Between approximately 2004 and January 2012, Dr. Hajcsar treated Patient A for a variety of health issues, including providing supportive psychotherapy and beginning in August 2011, cosmetic treatments.

Dr. Hajcsar inappropriately violated appropriate boundaries with Patient A on a number of occasions:
• by commenting inappropriately on Patient A’s physical appearance
• sometimes brushing back the front of Patient A’s hair when speaking to her
• kissing Patient A briefly while assisting her in putting on her coat when she was leaving the clinic on two or three occasions
• touching Patient A’s shoulder as she was leaving, in what she perceived as an affectionate manner
• hugging Patient A from time to time or putting an arm around her shoulder, either in greeting or by way of reassurance, for example when she was going to receive an influenza vaccination
• Patient A felt this behavior was confusing and odd

In 2012, at the conclusion of a follow-up assessment of a cosmetic treatment, Dr. Hajcsar joked to Patient A, offering to “test” her “new lips.” He then kissed her on the lips. It was not a long kiss, but Patient A described it as a “big kiss.” Dr. Hajcsar then walked into the waiting area with Patient A and, in the presence of Patient A and the receptionist, joked that he “gave [Patient A]’s lips a test drive.” Patient A heard laughter in the waiting room and was uncomfortable. This conduct violated the appropriate boundary between a physician and a patient.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
• the Registrar suspend Dr. Hajcsar’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months commencing at 12:01 am on June 1, 2014
• Dr. Hajcsar appear before the panel to be reprimanded
• Dr. Hajcsar pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2014

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jun 2020
Summary:
Effective August 11, 2021, Dr. Hajcsar has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 01 May 2014
Summary of Decision:
On May 1, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ernest Eugene Hajcsar committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hajcsar admitted to the allegation.

Dr. Hajcsar practises family medicine and offers cosmetic treatments in a clinic shared with his now ex-spouse. Dr. Hajcsar saw Patient A as a patient on numerous occasions including acting as her family physician when his ex-spouse, Patient A’s primary family physician, was on maternity leave. Between approximately 2004 and January 2012, Dr. Hajcsar treated Patient A for a variety of health issues, including providing supportive psychotherapy and beginning in August 2011, cosmetic treatments.

Dr. Hajcsar inappropriately violated appropriate boundaries with Patient A on a number of occasions:
• by commenting inappropriately on Patient A’s physical appearance
• sometimes brushing back the front of Patient A’s hair when speaking to her
• kissing Patient A briefly while assisting her in putting on her coat when she was leaving the clinic on two or three occasions
• touching Patient A’s shoulder as she was leaving, in what she perceived as an affectionate manner
• hugging Patient A from time to time or putting an arm around her shoulder, either in greeting or by way of reassurance, for example when she was going to receive an influenza vaccination
• Patient A felt this behavior was confusing and odd

In 2012, at the conclusion of a follow-up assessment of a cosmetic treatment, Dr. Hajcsar joked to Patient A, offering to “test” her “new lips.” He then kissed her on the lips. It was not a long kiss, but Patient A described it as a “big kiss.” Dr. Hajcsar then walked into the waiting area with Patient A and, in the presence of Patient A and the receptionist, joked that he “gave [Patient A]’s lips a test drive.” Patient A heard laughter in the waiting room and was uncomfortable. This conduct violated the appropriate boundary between a physician and a patient.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
• the Registrar suspend Dr. Hajcsar’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months commencing at 12:01 am on June 1, 2014
• Dr. Hajcsar appear before the panel to be reprimanded
• Dr. Hajcsar pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2014

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jun 2020
Summary:
Effective August 11, 2021, Dr. Hajcsar has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999