THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:17:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Allergy Group
Suite 4S-412, Sunnyside Bldg. East
30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 346 7766
Fax: 647 346 7785
Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Micheal Garron Hospital Medical Center
Suite 305
East York ON M4C 5T2
Phone: 4164657999
Fax: 4164618999
Address: St Joseph's Health Center
Department of Pediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294
Address: Suite 404, K Wing
640 Sammon Avenue
Toronto East General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
Phone: 416 465 7999
Fax: 416 461 8999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Allergy Group
Suite 4S-412, Sunnyside Bldg. East
30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 346 7766
Fax: 647 346 7785
Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Micheal Garron Hospital Medical Center
Suite 305
East York ON M4C 5T2
Phone: 4164657999
Fax: 4164618999
Address: St Joseph's Health Center
Department of Pediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294
Address: Suite 404, K Wing
640 Sammon Avenue
Toronto East General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
Phone: 416 465 7999
Fax: 416 461 8999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE D'ELBOUX MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE D'ELBOUX MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1999