THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Donnelly Wing 4 054c
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 3566
Fax: (416) 864-6013
Address: 190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie Ontario L4M4S5
Phone: (705) 726-2231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 208
Thornhill Ontario L4J6X2
Phone: 9057099696
Fax: 9057099764
Address: 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 507
Toronto Ontario M4P1P2
Phone: 4164886980
Fax: 4164883998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Donnelly Wing 4 054c
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 3566
Fax: (416) 864-6013
Address: 190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie Ontario L4M4S5
Phone: (705) 726-2231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 208
Thornhill Ontario L4J6X2
Phone: 9057099696
Fax: 9057099764
Address: 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 507
Toronto Ontario M4P1P2
Phone: 4164886980
Fax: 4164883998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999