THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:14:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: McCabe, Laura Elizabeth (Used Until: 25 Oct 2006)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6319
Fax: (416) 469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: McCabe, Laura Elizabeth (Used Until: 25 Oct 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6319
Fax: (416) 469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH GAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH GAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999