THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:39:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Solutions
Tel: 416-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 24 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Marrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marrat (CPSO#: 74037 )
Business Address: Suite 302
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 913-0964

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Solutions
Tel: 416-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 24 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Marrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marrat (CPSO#: 74037 )
Business Address: Suite 302
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 913-0964

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIDA MARRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIDA MARRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999