THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:37:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168833783
Fax: 4168832402
Address: Division of Cardiology
Southlake Regional Healthcare
Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Overgaard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168833783
Fax: 4168832402
Address: Division of Cardiology
Southlake Regional Healthcare
Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Overgaard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BRIAN OVERGAARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVERGAARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BRIAN OVERGAARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVERGAARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999