THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:19:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Aug 2002
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Aug 2002
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Feb 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 07 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paula Jean Harvey may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paula Jean Harvey may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1999