THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 23:04:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McGregor-Shaw and Sy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McGregor-Shaw and Sy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYSON MARY MCGREGOR-SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR-SHAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYSON MARY MCGREGOR-SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR-SHAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1999