THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:00:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 16 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. McLennan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 16 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. McLennan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999