THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:28:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2675 Concession Road
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2675 Concession Road
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA VIRGINIA DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA VIRGINIA DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1999