THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Garner Rd W
Jack Nathan Functional Health
Walk-In Clinic
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894500321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Garner Rd W
Jack Nathan Functional Health
Walk-In Clinic
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894500321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATICA SUMANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMANAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATICA SUMANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMANAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1999