THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:41:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Curtis Rd
Munno Para South Australia 5115
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 61 08 8254 4500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, patients should contact the practice location where they were treated by Dr. O’Donnell:

1) 2675 Concession Road, Kemptville, ON, K0G 1J0, 613-258-6133 (phone)
2) 100 Marie-Curie private, Ottawa, ON, K1N 6N5, 613-564-3950 (phone)
3) 311 McArthur Avenue, Suite 103, Ottawa, ON, K1L 8M3, 613-749-1678 (phone)
4) 1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans, Orleans, ON, K1C 7K3, 613-841-5389 (phone)
5) Kemptville District Hospital, PO Box 2007, 2675 Concession Road, Kemptville, ON, K0G 1J0, 613-258-6133 (phone)
6) Findley Creek Medical Centre, 4744 Bank Street, Gloucester, ON, K1T 3W7, 613-317-2584 (phone)
7) University of Ottawa – Health Services, Health Records Department, 613-737-8800 (phone)

Date Received: 20 Dec 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn O'Donnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Curtis Rd
Munno Para South Australia 5115
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 61 08 8254 4500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, patients should contact the practice location where they were treated by Dr. O’Donnell:

1) 2675 Concession Road, Kemptville, ON, K0G 1J0, 613-258-6133 (phone)
2) 100 Marie-Curie private, Ottawa, ON, K1N 6N5, 613-564-3950 (phone)
3) 311 McArthur Avenue, Suite 103, Ottawa, ON, K1L 8M3, 613-749-1678 (phone)
4) 1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans, Orleans, ON, K1C 7K3, 613-841-5389 (phone)
5) Kemptville District Hospital, PO Box 2007, 2675 Concession Road, Kemptville, ON, K0G 1J0, 613-258-6133 (phone)
6) Findley Creek Medical Centre, 4744 Bank Street, Gloucester, ON, K1T 3W7, 613-317-2584 (phone)
7) University of Ottawa – Health Services, Health Records Department, 613-737-8800 (phone)

Date Received: 20 Dec 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn O'Donnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN MICHAEL O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN MICHAEL O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1999