THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
23 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2000 to 22 Sep 2001
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 1999 to 22 Sep 2000
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
DATE: 23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
DATE: 23 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2000 to 22 Sep 2001
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Sep 2000
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 1999